+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 63)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-0
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from Rules
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from State Government (H)
- 1st reading
- Returned to State Government (H)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- To State Government (H)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-1
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2014
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor