+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- taken from Judiciary (H) 1st reading returned to Judiciary (H)
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H) posted in committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn passed 26-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3) received in House
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) filed, floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from Judiciary (S) 1st reading returned to Judiciary (S)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor