+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-1
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 33-4
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor