+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 81)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015
- Taken from Rules
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Posting waived
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (H)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2015
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Amend KRS 45A.850 to allow the executive director to recommend to the Secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet as a managing underwriter the Kentucky underwriter which received the highest score for specific bond transactions; clarify that the requirements, review, and recommendation of the Capital Projects and Bond Oversight committee will apply.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor