+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 119)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Taken from Banking & Insurance
- 1st reading
- Returned to Banking & Insurance
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Banking & Insurance
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2017
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendment
SCS1
Keep original provisions; amend to correct internal reference and add delayed effective date of January 1, 2018.