+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 110)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H) to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) posted in committee
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 2, 2021
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)