+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts ch. 31)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 87-4
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted in committee
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- received in House
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with floor amendment (1)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar floor amendment (1) filed
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate