+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Education (H)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Education (H)
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- To Education (H)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 28-7 with Committee Substitute
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2014
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Retain original provisions, except provide that a computer programming language course will be accepted as an elective course.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor