+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- To Education
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) & committee amendment (1-title)
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) & Committee amendment (1-title)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Education
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor