+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 25-11 with Committee Substitute & floor amendment (1)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Banking & Insurance
- 1st reading
- Taken from Banking & Insurance
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Banking & Insurance
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SFA1
Amend "nonemergency service" in Section 1 to "nonemergency health care service" to conform with usage of term in Act; correct internal reference in Section 6 of Act.
SCS1
Amend original provision to remove references to and the compliance requirement for the State Medicaid Program; Amend KRS 304.17A-005 to define "emergency services," and "nonemergency service." EFFECTIVE January 14, 2016.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor