+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 122)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 86-0
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2013
- Taken from Rules
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from Licensing & Occupations (H)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Licensing & Occupations (H)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor