+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 73)
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-6
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Judiciary (H)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Judiciary (H)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Amend KRS 237.110 relating to the issuance of licenses to carry a concealed deadly weapon to remove the length of residency requirement, retain residency requirement, and reduce from 90 days to 60 days the length of time after receipt of application items from the sheriff that the Department of Kentucky State Police has to approve or deny an application for a license.