+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Health & Welfare
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SFA2
Make Title Amendment.
SFA1
Amend KRS 205.560 to add "gastrointestinal, and food allergic" to the type of conditions to be treated; include food protein allergies, food protein-induced enterocolitis syndrome, eosinophilic disorders, and short-bowel syndrome in the list of inborn errors of metabolism or genetic conditions; amend KRS 304.17A-258 to include eosinophilic disorders, food protein allergies, food protein-induced enterocolitis syndrome, and short bowel disorders in the definition of "therapeutic food, formulas, and supplements"; define "amino acid-based elemental formula"; amend KRS 18A.225 to require any policy provided to state employees to cover amino acid-based elemental formulas; EMERGENCY.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor