+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 9)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To Agriculture
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2017
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor