+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Education (S)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SCS
Retain original provisions; allow superintendent's designee to act on behalf of superintendent; require school principal and school counsel to consult prior to providing policy recommendations to superintendent or designee; require superintendent or designee to adopt school policies.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor