+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 95)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- To Health and Family Services
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2018
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor