+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate