+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 112)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Passed 36-0
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Monday, March 31, 2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Rules (S)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To Judiciary (H)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (2) filed
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 11, 2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
HCS/LM
Amend to name the bill in honor of Clara Madeline Gilliam.
SFA (2, W. Westerfield)
Amend to require a doctor's order in lieu of a doctor's recommendation when the cannabidiol is to be acquired through a research hospital.
SFA (1, W. Westerfield)
Amend to specify that the authorizing public university must be located in Kentucky.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor