+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 58)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) passed 37-0 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Rules (S)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- to Agriculture (H)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2022
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent bill
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)