+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 14)
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- to Health Services (H)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-0
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- to Health Services (S)
On January 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)