+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 33)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 87-0
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- To Transportation
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendment (1)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2018
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Transportation
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendment
SFA1
Require submission of a platooning plan to the State Police for review; limit the definition of a platoon to two vehicles.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor