+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Received in Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2017
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Health & Welfare
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Health & Welfare
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Health & Welfare
- 1st reading
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor