+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to State & Local Government
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate