+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 80)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Bill passed 36-1
- Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Rules (S)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute
- Floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2015
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Posting waived
- Posted in committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Received in House
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 32-0
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
HFA (1, J. Greer)
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 requiring high schools to include CPR training in the health education curriculum.
HFA (2/Title, J. Greer)
Make title amendment.
HCS
Amend KRS 205.8477 to establish that Medicaid providers shall provide operating disclosures to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and to other entities in established circumstances; amend KRS 212.786 to reduce the number of members on the independent district boards of health, remove proportional representation of certain professions, and amend to population requirements for appointments; and amend KRS 212.784 to prohibit independent district boards of health from adopting rules and regulations in conflict with state laws and regulations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor