+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 40)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 received in Senate enrolled, signed by President of the Senate enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- taken from Education (H) 2nd reading returned to Education (H)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Committee on Committees (H) taken from Committee on Committees (H) 1st reading returned to Committee on Committees (H) to Education (H) posted in committee
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Education (S) 2nd reading returned to Education (S)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Education (S) 1st reading returned to Education (S)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Education (S)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- introduced in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)