+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 95-0
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor