+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 94-0
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- To Natural Resources & Environment (H)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House