+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 100-0
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To Tourism Development & Energy (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor