+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 49-46 with committee amendment (1)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 12, 2014
- Taken from Rules
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCA (1, D. Owens)
Amend the date by which the study results are to be reported to the Legislative Research Commission from October 30, 2014, to November 30, 2014.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor