+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- adopted by voice vote
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules taken from Rules to House Floor
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- to Agriculture (H)
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)