+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 95-0 with floor amendment (1)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from Rules
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- To State Government (H)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HFA (1, K. Imes)
Insert new WHEREAS clause language expressing intent of Department of Parks to supplement guest services and protect and enhance parks operations, facilities, and jobs, and to express goal of supporting the jobs of its employees.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor