+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 94-0
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 7, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House