+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 86-0
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House