+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- veto not acted upon veto sustained
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 3rd reading, adopted 26-8 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Committee on Committees (H) placed in the Orders of the Day adopted 67-25
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor