+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 94-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
- Posted in committee
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business (H)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HCS
Retain original provisions of the bill, except amend to allow research to include second generation biofuels.
HCA (1/Title, T. McKee)
Make title amendment.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor