+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 144)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
- Adopted 98-0
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Delivered to Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules (H)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
- To Rules (H)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014
- 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
- Floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Transportation (H)
+ − Amendments (6)
SCS
Retain provisions of the GA version, with the following exceptions: remove permanent road naming designations for living individuals; add other honorary road designations and erections of honorary signs.
SFA (1, B. Smith)
Designate bridges and portions of roads in memory of Matt and Mary Stidham, Pvt. Arnold Morgan, Cpl. Stevie Smallwood, and Jordan Melton.
SFA (2, C. McDaniel)
Designate a portion of KY 1072 in Kenton County as the Sergeant Daniel Tyler Lee Memorial Highway.
SFA (3, J. Higdon)
Correct incorrect bridge reference in Marion County in memory of Sister Sodelbia Hughes.
HCS
Retain original provisions; add other honorary road designations and erections of honorary signs.
HCA (1/Title, H. Collins)
Make title amendment.