+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 99-0
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To State Government (H)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House