+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 61)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, adopted 38-0
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, adopted 96-0
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- Posting waived
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To Education (H)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor