+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, Febuary 12, 2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House