+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts ch. 33)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 23-10
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- to Education (S)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 86-7 with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 12, 2020 floor amendments (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute (2)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 24, 2020 floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On November 15, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).