+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Licensing & Occupations (S)
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).