+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Licensing & Occupations (S)
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-0
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On December 2, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).