+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Judiciary (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Judiciary (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Judiciary (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Judiciary (S)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary (S)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 11, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS/LM/CI
Amend to limit scope of the bill to KRS Chapter 508 relating to assaults.