+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 186)
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023 3rd reading, passed 35-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 98-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S) taken from Committee on Committees (S) 1st reading returned to Committee on Committees (S) to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor