+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 31)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 3rd reading, passed 35-0 received in House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor