+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 14)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38--0
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 15, 2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with floor amendment (1)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1), (2), (3) filed
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 15
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business
- Introduced in House
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendments (3)
HFA1
Allow an accredited college or university to take part in reference tobacco product sale or transfer; describe reference tobacco product responsibilities; amend KRS 138.140 to exempt reference tobacco products from tobacco excise taxes.
HFA2
Describe reference tobacco product responsibilities; amend KRS 138.140 to exempt reference tobacco products from tobacco excise taxes.
HFA3
Allow an accredited college or university to take part in reference tobacco product sale or transfer.