+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs
- Introduced in House
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Retain original provisions except amend KRS 121.150 to change the contribution limitation to one permanent committee or contributing organization in any one year, to remove limitation amounts a slate of candidates for Governor and Lt. Governor and their families can loan to their campaign committees and receive in repayment, to eliminate prohibition on post primary, regular and special election contributions for expenses, and to eliminate prohibitions regarding contributions from permanent committees; amend KRS 121.180 to change the dates of filing reports before and after election, and to permit the filing of reports in either paper or electronic format
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor