+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts Ch. 195)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019 3rd reading, passed 38-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 1st reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading floor amendment (2) ruled not germane passed 89-5
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- floor amendment (5) filed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- floor amendments (2) (3) and (4-title) filed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules floor amendment (1) filed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- to State Government (H)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).