+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 78)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1)
- Passed 72-22
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received in House
- To Rules (H)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 74-19
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Posting waived
- Posted in committee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Education (H)
+ − Amendments (2)
SFA (1, M. Wilson)
Delete language that required an add-on to a district's base level funding for the number of refugees of legal aliens enrolled in school who have passed their 21st birthday during the school year and remained officially enrolled until the end of the year.
SCS
Retain original provisions, except allow a local board of education to provide services to refugees and legal aliens until the student graduates or until the end of the school year in which the student reached the age of 21, whichever occurs first.