+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 73)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 91-0
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Licensing & Occupations (S)
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On October 21, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).